Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 18:50:24 (UTC).

Kathleen Zyglis et al v. Kurt Von Fricken M.D.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Kathleen Zyglis filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Kurt Von Fricken M D. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathleen Zyglis

Michael Zyglis

Defendant

Kurt Von fricken M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAUER, WILLIAM G

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SWEET, KATHLEEN MARIE

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

WATSON, CRAIG RANDALL

Attorney at GIBSON MCASKILL & CROSBY, LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons, Pleadings, Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons, Pleadings, Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit of Service By Mail

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit of Service By Mail; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Summons, Pleadings, Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit of Service By Mail; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Sweet, K.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Bauer, W.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less