This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 01:24:48 (UTC).

KASHOYA BROWN - v. - NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 KASHOYA BROWN filed an Other lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kashoya Brown

Defendants

3 SUPER MOVERS LLC

Curtis dejean Sidney

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Michael R Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHERNY, ALEKSANDR SIMON

Attorney at Cherny & Podolsky

PODOLSKY, STEVEN VYACHESLAV

Attorney at Cherny & Podolsky, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

HOLLANDER, JEFFREY J

Attorney at RICHARD T. LAU & ASSOCIATES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

JOSEPH-ST. BERNARD, JAMILA E.

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT AUTHORITY

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dtd 10/8/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dtd 10/8/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 3/25/19

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 3/25/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER stipulation to adjourn the Note of Issue

STIPULATION - OTHER stipulation to adjourn the Note of Issue; Filed By: Cherny, A.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

ORDER - OTHER Dated 01/15/2019

ORDER - OTHER Dated 01/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2018; Received: 04/30/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/04/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/04/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cherny, A.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Hollander, J.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Joseph-St. Bernard, J.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cherny, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cherny, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) and Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) and Demands; Filed By: Joseph-St. Bernard, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dtd 10/8/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/11/2019; Received: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 3/25/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER stipulation to adjourn the Note of Issue; Filed By: Cherny, A.; Filed: 06/24/2019; Received: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated 01/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2018; Received: 04/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/04/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cherny, A.; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Hollander, J.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Joseph-St. Bernard, J.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Cherny, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cherny, A. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) and Demands; Filed By: Joseph-St. Bernard, J.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Podolsky, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cherny, A.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less