Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 14:32:46 (UTC).

KAROL ZIEBA - v. - THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 KAROL ZIEBA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karol Zieba

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

RICI CORP.

THE CITY OF NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

NEW YORK CITY SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION AUTHORITY and

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TUMELTY, JOHN PHILIP

Attorney at Law Office of John Tumelty & Associates

Tumelty, John P

Attorney at Tumelty & Spier, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ERENBURG, ARAM LEE

Attorney at Cornell Grace PC

RAFTER, JOHN T.

Attorney at RAFTER & ASSOCIATES PLLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Erenburg, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4); Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #4) Good Faith Letter - 11.20.2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #4) Good Faith Letter - 11.20.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Good Faith Letter - 10.31.2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Good Faith Letter - 10.31.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Order - 7.18.2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Order - 7.18.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Order - 6.17.2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Order - 6.17.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Third Supplemental Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Third Supplemental Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Final Pre-Note Order - 2/7/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Final Pre-Note Order - 2/7/2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Preclude

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Preclude; Filed By: Rafter, J.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a BP and Discovery Responses

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a BP and Discovery Responses; Filed By: Rafter, J.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Rafter, J.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #4); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Erenburg, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4); Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #4) Good Faith Letter - 11.20.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Good Faith Letter - 10.31.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Order - 7.18.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) Order - 6.17.2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Third Supplemental Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Final Pre-Note Order - 2/7/2019; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Answer; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Rafter, J.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Preclude; Filed By: Rafter, J.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a BP and Discovery Responses; Filed By: Rafter, J.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Rafter, J.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less