This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 14:41:21 (UTC).

Karl B. Booker Jr. v. Ali Skudrinja

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Karl B Booker Jr filed an Other lawsuit against Ali Skudrinja. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Tracey A Bannister. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Tracey A Bannister

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karl B. Booker JR.

Defendant

Ali Skundrinja

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOLBA, TAYLOR DAVID

Attorney at LIPSITZ GREEN SCIME CAMBRIA LLP

WHITENIGHT, MAXWELL

Attorney at Bargnesi Britt PLLC

Defendant Attorney

NALLAN, ANTHONY JOHN

Attorney at Law Office of Buratti, Rothenberg, & Burns

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Law Offices of Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Burns & Nallan Attorneys at Law; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Burns & Nallan Attorneys at Law; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Burns & Nallan Attorneys at Law; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Burns & Nallan Attorneys at Law; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Whitenight, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Correspondence to Coast National Insurance

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Correspondence to Coast National Insurance; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Skip Trace dated May 9, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Skip Trace dated May 9, 2019; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Non-Service - April 17, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Non-Service - April 17, 2019; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Non-Service - April 16, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Non-Service - April 16, 2019; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Accident Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Accident Report; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Law Offices of Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Law Offices of Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Law Offices of Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Law Offices of Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Nallan, A. - filed by Law Offices of Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Whitenight, M.; Filed: 07/24/2019; Received: 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Correspondence to Coast National Insurance; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Skip Trace dated May 9, 2019; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Non-Service - April 17, 2019; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Affidavit of Non-Service - April 16, 2019; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Accident Report; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Golba, T.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less