This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 06:42:58 (UTC).

JUWANA BROWN v. BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 JUWANA BROWN filed an Other lawsuit against BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juwana Brown

Defendants

NYC DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LULICH, AIMEE KARA

Attorney at NYC LAW DEPARTMENT

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) CASE SUPPORT

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) CASE SUPPORT; Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Identification Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Identification Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER

RJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

NOTICE OF PETITION

NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

PETITION CHANGE OF BIRTH RECORDS

PETITION CHANGE OF BIRTH RECORDS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) CASE SUPPORT; Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Identification Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Lulich, A.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION CHANGE OF BIRTH RECORDS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less