Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 22:42:00 (UTC).

JUSTIN JOHN FLOOD v. KENNETH BECKER M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 JUSTIN JOHN FLOOD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KENNETH BECKER M D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justin John Flood , as Executor of the Estate of ONNALEE FLOOD, decedent

Defendants

Ritha Alhindawi M.D.

Kelly Hinton M.D.

Sydney Yoon M.D.

Anubhav Agarwal M.D.

Iheanyicukwu Aja-onu M.D.

Gabriel Becchinelli M.D.

Stephen Lastig M.D.

Aviva Kamath M.D.

Shawndeep Tung M.D.

Jeremy Bosworthy M.D.

Kenneth Becker M.D.

SOUTH NASSAU COMMUNITIES HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN, BRAD ARTHUR

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF BRAD A. KAUFFMAN, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

FITZMAURICE, STACY

Attorney at ELLENBERG GANNON HENNINGER FITZMAURICE & LIM, LLP

OPERMAN, DENA

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

WILLNER, NEIL MICHAEL

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

CAMMAROSANO, JOSEPH R.

Attorney at DOPF, PC

MCCARTHY, JAMES DENIS

Attorney at ANGEL & McCARTHY, PLLC

SCOTT, STEVE K

Attorney at Kelly, Rode & Kelly, LLP

WILSON, GEORGE J

Attorney at KELLY RODE KELLY, LLP

CAFARO, CHRISTOPHER THOMAS

Attorney at MONTFORT HEALY MCGUIRE & SALLEY

MANZIONE, STUART J.

Attorney at Furey, Furey, Leverage & Darlington, P.C.

DELUCA, JOSEPHINE

Attorney at Furey, Furey, Leverage, Manzione, Williams & Darlington, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION

--none--

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

STIPULATION - OTHER

Stipulation permitting plaintiff to file Notice of Medical Malpractice

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

Statement Of Authorization

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

Certificate Of Merit

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons And Complaint

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE; Filed By: Fitzmaurice, S.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDING CAPTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Fitzmaurice, S.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation permitting plaintiff to file Notice of Medical Malpractice; Filed By: Kauffman, B.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kauffman, B.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Kauffman, B.; Filed: 01/31/2018; Received: 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/22/2017; Received: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate Of Merit; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint; Filed By: Kauffman, B. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less