This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 21:54:59 (UTC).

Julio A. Crisostomo v. Mark C. Franco et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Julio A Crisostomo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mark C Franco. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julio A. Crisostomo

Defendants

Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC

PV Holding Corp.

Avis Rent A Car System, LLC

Mark C. Franco

AESOP Leasing L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINLEY, GLENN

Attorney at GLENN FINLEY & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorneys

ARONOWITZ, DAVID S.

Attorney at Pillinger Miller & Tarallo

MILLER, JEFFREY TODD

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 2/11/20

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 2/11/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED AUGUST 27,2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED AUGUST 27,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Photographs

EXHIBIT(S) - A Photographs; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Preliminary Conference Order

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 06/25/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 06/25/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

DEMAND FOR: Various Demands

DEMAND FOR: Various Demands; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PVC, Avis Rent, Avis Budget, Aesop

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PVC, Avis Rent, Avis Budget, Aesop; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Franco

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Franco; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 2/11/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 11/04/2019; Received: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED AUGUST 27,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Photographs; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 06/25/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Various Demands; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Aronowitz, D.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PVC, Avis Rent, Avis Budget, Aesop; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Franco; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less