Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 12:14:11 (UTC).

Juana Perron et al v. Ronald Goodrich

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 Juana Perron filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ronald Goodrich. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amable Meran-lusiano

Juana Perron

Defendant

Ronald Goodrich

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMBARERI, MARK P

Attorney at Mark P. Cambareri

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

COLE-HATCHARD, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at Law Office of Stephen J. Cole-Hatchard

Defendant Attorneys

QUEENAN, KAREN MCCORMICK

Attorney at Law Office of Brian Rayhill

QUEENAN, KAREN M

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BRIAN RAYHILL

BECKER, SHANNON RAE

Attorney at O'Connor McGuinness Conte Doyle Oleson Watson & Loftus, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2018; Received: 11/23/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation- Motion to Renew

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation- Motion to Renew; Filed By: Cambareri, M.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Independent Medical Examination

DEMAND FOR: Notice for Independent Medical Examination; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/19/2017; Received: 04/19/2017

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/29/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2); Filed By: Cole-Hatchard, S.; Filed: 11/27/2018; Received: 11/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2018; Received: 11/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation- Motion to Renew; Filed By: Cambareri, M.; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) EMT, Elizabeth Trappe's Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 11/20/2018; Received: 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice for Independent Medical Examination; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Queenan, K.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/19/2017; Received: 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less