This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:40:12 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK , NATIONAL ASSOCITION - v. - GLORIA LEWIS et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK , NATIONAL ASSOCITION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GLORIA LEWIS. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK , NATIONAL ASSOCITION

Defendants

TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC AAO PROVIDAN NATIONAL BANK

JANE DOE

STATE OF NEW YORK

JOHN DOE

Marilyn Lewis

CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Gloria Lewis

Marcia A Lewis

METRO PORTFOLIOS, INC

CITY OF NEW YORK ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

MIDLAND FUNDING NCC-2 CORP

ARROW FINNCIAL SERVICES LLC

CITY OF NEW YORK DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

PALISADES COLLECTION LLC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CASE, DAVID P

Attorney at RELIN, GOLDSTEIN & CRANE, L.L.P.

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 2/22/18

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 2/22/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) VERIFIED ANSWER

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) VERIFIED ANSWER; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY, SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY, SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER DISCONTINUING THE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLING THE NOTICE OF PENDENCY

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER DISCONTINUING THE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLING THE NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MARILYN LEWIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MARILYN LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 MARCIA LEWIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 MARCIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MARCIA LEWIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MARCIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 GLORIA LEWIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 GLORIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS GLORIA LEWIS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS GLORIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 2/22/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) VERIFIED ANSWER; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY, SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER DISCONTINUING THE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLING THE NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 MARILYN LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MARILYN LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 MARCIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MARCIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS 3215 GLORIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS GLORIA LEWIS; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by RedVision Systems, Inc.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less