Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 00:21:20 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. STEVEN P FARR et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STEVEN P FARR. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Erin P Gall. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0014

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Erin P Gall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

Steven P Farr

Jessica Farr

Not Yet Classified

FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

CASE, DAVID P

Attorney at RELIN, GOLDSTEIN & CRANE, L.L.P.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF ENTRY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #03) NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #03) NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #03)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #03); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY LETTER

INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY LETTER; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #03) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #03) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT FARR - OCCUPANT - AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING (1303B)

AFFIDAVIT FARR - OCCUPANT - AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING (1303B); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT DOE A/K/A JESSICA FARR - AFFDIAVIT OF MAILING (1303B)

AFFIDAVIT DOE A/K/A JESSICA FARR - AFFDIAVIT OF MAILING (1303B); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A JESSICA FARR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A JESSICA FARR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIDAVIT STEVEN P. FARR - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT STEVEN P. FARR - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STEVEN P. FARR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STEVEN P. FARR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #03) NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 02/17/2020; Received: 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #03); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 01/27/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATIONAL STATEMENT PLAINTIFF TO NOTIFY LETTER; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/27/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #03) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #03) CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #03) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FARR - OCCUPANT - AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING (1303B); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DOE A/K/A JESSICA FARR - AFFDIAVIT OF MAILING (1303B); Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A JESSICA FARR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT STEVEN P. FARR - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STEVEN P. FARR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less