This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 22:35:39 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. JOSEPH D'ANGELO AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES A. D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES DANGELO et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOSEPH D'ANGELO AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES A D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES DANGELO. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5 said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises being foreclose

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

JOSEPH D'ANGELO AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES A. D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES DANGELO

Not Yet Classified

FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BASOGLU, MEHMET

Attorney at Fein, Such, Kahn & Shepard, P.C.

PAVLIK, CHRISTOPHER EMIL

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski & Manfro, LLP

SPINELLI, VICTOR

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

SEBASTIAN, SIMONE AMANDA PERSAUD

Attorney at FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

TABAKIN, GREGG P

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH, KAHN & SHEPARD, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY, AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY, AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT B; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT A

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) NOTICE OF MFOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND DISCONTINUE ACTION

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) NOTICE OF MFOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter Requesting Withdrawal of Order of Reference and Default Judgment

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter Requesting Withdrawal of Order of Reference and Default Judgment; Filed By: Basoglu, M.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY, AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT B; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT A; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) NOTICE OF MFOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND DISCONTINUE ACTION; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter Requesting Withdrawal of Order of Reference and Default Judgment; Filed By: Basoglu, M.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE CONFERENCE NOTICE; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSEPH D'ANGELO AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES A. D'ANGELO A/K/A JAMES DANGELO - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less