This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 18:53:28 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - v. - JAMES A. HILL JR. et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES A HILL JR. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A Onofry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2018

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A Onofry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DISCOVER BANK

LVNV FUNDING LLC

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), NA

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Maria Josephine Miele A/K/A MARIA MIELE A/K/A MARIA J. MIELE-HILL A/K/A MARIA JOSEPHINE HILL A/K/A MARIA J. HILL

James A. Hill JR. A/K/A JAMES A. HILL

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5 said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises being foreclose

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Not Yet Classified

FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SEBASTIAN, SIMONE AMANDA PERSAUD

Attorney at FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

PAVLIK, CHRISTOPHER EMIL

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski & Manfro, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

GATTO, CHRISTOPHER M

Attorney at STATE OF NEW YORK OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Not Yet Classified Attorney

TABAKIN, GREGG P

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH, KAHN & SHEPARD, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)

ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) FILED NOTICE OF PENDENCY

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) FILED NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) FILED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) FILED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF THE ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT P ... show more

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF THE ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT P ... show more; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) PROPOSED ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) PROPOSED ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), NA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), NA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LVNV FUNDING LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LVNV FUNDING LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) FILED NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) FILED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF THE ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) PROPOSED ORDER TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND TO DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY AND DISCONTINUE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Filed By: Sebastian, S.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gatto, C.; Filed: 12/21/2018; Received: 12/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIDLAND FUNDING LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), NA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LVNV FUNDING LLC - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pavlik, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less