This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 15:28:14 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association v. Gary Raiti et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Gary Raiti. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Defendants

City Court Clerk on behalf of People of the State of New York

JOHN DOE, said name being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein, and any parties, corporations or entities, if any, having or claiming an interest or lien upon the mortg

State of New York

Salina Town Court on behalf of People of the State of New York

Fleet National Bank

Gary Raiti a/k/a Gary E. Raiti, as Executor of the Estate of Joseph Raiti a/k/a Joseph E. Raiti, and as Trustee of the Joseph E. Raiti Testamentary Trust

Onondaga County Department of Social Services on behalf of Jana L. Young

Jana Lee Young a/k/a Jana L. Raiti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ROGERS, HEATHER C

Attorney at DAVIDSON, FINK, LLP

ENGEL, PAULA MALLORY

Attorney at ONONDAGA COUNTY DEPT OF LAW

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment Letter Affidavit of Service by Mail

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment Letter Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Notice of Appearance

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, Notice of Pendency, and Additional Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, Notice of Pendency, and Additional Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 90 Day Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 90 Day Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SALINA TOWN COURT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SALINA TOWN COURT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATE OF NY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATE OF NY; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS(1303)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS(1303); Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FLEET NATIONAL BANK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FLEET NATIONAL BANK; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Adjournment Letter Affidavit of Service by Mail; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Copy of Summons; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Notice of Appearance; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint, Notice of Pendency, and Additional Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) 90 Day Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Demand Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITY OF COURT CLERK; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SALINA TOWN COURT; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STATE OF NY; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS(1303); Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FLEET NATIONAL BANK; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less