This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:37:44 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. DIANNE LUMSDEN et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DIANNE LUMSDEN. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

Devon Lumsden A/K/A DEVON A. LUMSDEN

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER

JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5 said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien upon the premises being foreclose

Dianne Lumsden A/K/A DIANNE JARVIS

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

SPINELLI, VICTOR

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

TABAKIN, GREGG P

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH, KAHN & SHEPARD, P.C.

BASOGLU, MEHMET

Attorney at Fein, Such, Kahn & Shepard, P.C.

BROWNE, LISA MARIE

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SWIFT, PETER ANDREW

Attorney at Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLP

NELSON, JONATHAN BRETT

Attorney at DORF & NELSON LLP

Green, Amanda Rose

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001)

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nelson, J.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE DATED 1/27/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE DATED 1/27/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001)

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE DATED: DECEMBER 17, 2019

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE DATED: DECEMBER 17, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001)

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SOPHIA

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SOPHIA; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A SOPHIA CLARKE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A SOPHIA CLARKE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC D/B/A MR. COO(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC D/B/A MR. COO(..); Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nelson, J.; Filed: 03/13/2020; Received: 03/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE DATED 1/27/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE DATED: DECEMBER 17, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001); Filed By: Browne, L.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nelson, J.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A GAVIN CLARKE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - SOPHIA; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A SOPHIA CLARKE - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. AS NOMINEE FOR NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less