This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 02:49:54 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - v. - DANIEL J. GRAHAM et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DANIEL J GRAHAM. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

Allison Ruby Brand

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Melissa Kominski

Daniel J. Graham

CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH & CRANE, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

GINDI, MICHAEL EDDIE

BASOGLU, MEHMET

Attorney at Fein, Such, Kahn & Shepard, P.C.

MONTERO, CHRISTHIE MARIA

Attorney at Fein, Such & Crane, LLP

PAVLIK, CHRISTOPHER EMIL

Attorney at Knuckles, Komosinski & Manfro, LLP

SPINELLI, VICTOR

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH & CRANE, LLP

TABAKIN, GREGG P

Attorney at FEIN, SUCH, KAHN & SHEPARD, P.C.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Exhibits in support of Order Extending Time to proceed to Sale pursuant to Judgment of Foreclosure a ... show more

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Exhibits in support of Order Extending Time to proceed to Sale pursuant to Judgment of Foreclosure a ... show more; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

NOTICE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 04, 2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 04, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #003)

ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT ALLISON RUBY BRAND - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT ALLISON RUBY BRAND - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLISON RUBY BRAND - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLISON RUBY BRAND - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT DANIEL J. GRAHAM - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT DANIEL J. GRAHAM - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANIEL J. GRAHAM - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANIEL J. GRAHAM - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Exhibits in support of Order Extending Time to proceed to Sale pursuant to Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Spinelli, V.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 04, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) EXHIBIT Q - AFF FOR ATTORNEY FEES - for Order confirming Referee Report and for a Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Basoglu, M.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF FINANCE PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT ALLISON RUBY BRAND - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLISON RUBY BRAND - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DANIEL J. GRAHAM - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANIEL J. GRAHAM - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Tabakin, G. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less