This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 15:33:52 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Roma New York Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Roma New York Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Roma New York Inc.

Gerald Mccrystal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARINELLO, LEONARD

Attorney at c/o Bonchonsky & Zaino, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Filed Affidavit of Service of 3215 Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - D Filed Affidavit of Service of 3215 Notice; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Transaction History Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Transaction History Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Roma New York Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Roma New York Inc.; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Filed Affidavit of Service of 3215 Notice; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Transaction History Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Roma New York Inc.; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less