This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 19:12:54 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Arazi Diamonds Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arazi Diamonds Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard D Steinman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Leonard D Steinman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Arazi Diamonds Inc.

Albir L. Arazi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARINELLO, LEONARD

Attorney at c/o Bonchonsky & Zaino, LLP

Defendant Attorney

QUAIL, JAMES JOSEPH

Attorney at JAMES J. QUAIL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Judgment (Correction to NYSCEF Doc. 34)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Judgment (Correction to NYSCEF Doc. 34); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Court Order Directing Entry of Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A Court Order Directing Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Order; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001)

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Quail, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Additional Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Additional Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3215(g); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service on All Defendants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service on All Defendants; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Judgment (Correction to NYSCEF Doc. 34); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Court Order Directing Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Order; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Quail, J.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Additional Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3215(g); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service on All Defendants; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marinello, L.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less