This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 13:34:50 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. - v. - Allen Densten et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Allen Densten. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1083

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development

Allen Densten a/k/a Allen L. Densten

John Doe #1 through #6, and Jane Doe #1 through #6, the last twelve names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien up

Not Yet Classified

BUCKLEY MADOLE, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

INCORVAIA, CHRISTINA ALICIA

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

DAGOUNIS, MARIKA DENISE

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

Defendant Attorney

LARKIN, WILLIAM F

Attorney at US ATTORNEYS OFFICE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF N.Y.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M.; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Dagounis, M.; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - JESSICA

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - JESSICA; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A JESSICA DENSTEN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A JESSICA DENSTEN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT ALLEN DENSTEN A/K/A ALLEN L. DENSTEN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT ALLEN DENSTEN A/K/A ALLEN L. DENSTEN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLEN DENSTEN A/K/A ALLEN L. DENSTEN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLEN DENSTEN A/K/A ALLEN L. DENSTEN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - DENSTEN

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - DENSTEN; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dagounis, M.; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Dagounis, M.; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - JESSICA; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A JESSICA DENSTEN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SECRETARY OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT ALLEN DENSTEN A/K/A ALLEN L. DENSTEN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALLEN DENSTEN A/K/A ALLEN L. DENSTEN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - RJI - DENSTEN; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES; Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Incorvaia, C. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less