This case was last updated from Queens County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 00:31:24 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as successor in interest to Washington Mutual Bank, F.A. v. Rajinder Singh et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A as successor in interest to Washington Mutual Bank, F A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Rajinder Singh. This case was filed in Queens County Courts, Queens County Supreme Court Civil Term - 1 located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Queens, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as successor in interest to Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.

Defendants

New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau

Worldwide Asset Purchasing, LLC as successor in interest to Direct Merchant Bank, N.A.

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

Rajinder Singh

United States of America Department of Justice United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Michigan,

Fleet Mortgage Corp.,

Citibank (South Dakota) NA

Criminal Court of the City of New York

JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.,

Office of the City Register of the City of New York

Melrose Credit Union

New York City Parking Violations Bureau

United States of America Internal Revenue Service

New York City Environmental Control Board

Attorney General of the United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SACKOOR, JASON PAUL

FROMMER, ROBERT W

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service by mail CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA B/S/U New York State Department of Financial Services

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service by mail CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA B/S/U New York State Department of Financial Services; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE "JOHN DOE" #1 THROUGH "JOHN DOE" #100

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE "JOHN DOE" #1 THROUGH "JOHN DOE" #100; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/06/2020; Received: 08/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MOHINDER KAUR S/H/A JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MOHINDER KAUR S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/06/2020; Received: 08/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/05/2020; Received: 08/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAJINDER SINGH

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAJINDER SINGH; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/31/2020; Received: 07/31/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELROSE CREDIT UNION

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELROSE CREDIT UNION; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sackoor, J. - filed by King, E.; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/20/2020; Received: 07/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/20/2020; Received: 07/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - E Mortgage; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D note

EXHIBIT(S) - D note; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - C Deed; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B sch and judgments

EXHIBIT(S) - B sch and judgments; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A sch A

EXHIBIT(S) - A sch A; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service by mail CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA B/S/U New York State Department of Financial Services; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE "JOHN DOE" #1 THROUGH "JOHN DOE" #100; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/06/2020; Received: 08/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MOHINDER KAUR S/H/A JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/06/2020; Received: 08/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 08/05/2020; Received: 08/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RAJINDER SINGH; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/31/2020; Received: 07/31/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELROSE CREDIT UNION; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sackoor, J. - filed by King, E.; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DIRECT MERCHANT BANK, N.A.; Filed By: Sackoor, J. - filed by King, E.; Filed: 07/28/2020; Received: 07/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/20/2020; Received: 07/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Frommer, R. - filed by ServiceWorks National LLC; Filed: 07/20/2020; Received: 07/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Mortgage; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D note; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Deed; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B sch and judgments; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A sch A; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Frommer, R.; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less