This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 01:56:55 (UTC).

JOYCE EDWARDS GREENHILL v. BAY PARK CENTER FOR NURSING & REHABILITATION, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 JOYCE EDWARDS GREENHILL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BAY PARK CENTER FOR NURSING REHABILITATION, LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph E Capella. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph E Capella

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce Edwards greenhill as Proposed Administrator of the Estate of GERTRUDE EDWARDS, deceased, and JOYCE EDWARDS GREENHILL, Individually

Defendant

BAY PARK CENTER FOR NURSING & REHABILITATION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REDMOND, CORNELIUS JOSEPH

Attorney at REDMOND LAW, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

SEMLIES, LORI ROSEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER

VERBOS, MEGAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Death Certificate Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Death Certificate Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) guardianship order Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) guardianship order Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) pleadings; Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for BP & Combined Demands

DEMAND FOR: Demand for BP & Combined Demands; Filed By: Semlies, L.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Semlies, L.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Redmond, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Redmond, J.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Death Certificate Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Redmond, C.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) guardianship order Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) pleadings; Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Verbos, M.; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for BP & Combined Demands; Filed By: Semlies, L.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Semlies, L.; Filed: 06/14/2019; Received: 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Redmond, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Redmond, J.; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less