This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:08:25 (UTC).

JOVON GRIFFITH v. JUAN GUILLERMO et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 JOVON GRIFFITH filed an Other lawsuit against JUAN GUILLERMO. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jovon Griffith

Defendants

AMERICAN UNITED TRANSPORTATION II, INC.

Juan Guillermo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLUMEN, ALAN

Attorney at Blumen & Shayne, PLLC.

POMARA, FRANCESCO

Attorney at MALLILO & GROSSMAN

Defendant Attorney

MULHOLLAND, RORY THOMAS

Attorney at ABRAMS, FENSTERMAN, FENSTERMAN, EISMAN, FORMATO, FERRARA & WOLF, LLP

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pomara, F.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/8/2019.

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/8/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 1/10/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 1/10/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Pomara, F.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

ANSWER Notice of Appearance, Verified Answer & Demands

ANSWER Notice of Appearance, Verified Answer & Demands; Filed By: Mulholland, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 1/10/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/8/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Pomara, F. - filed by Roz Silverstein & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pomara, F.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Pomara, F.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Notice of Appearance, Verified Answer & Demands; Filed By: Mulholland, R.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less