Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 05:52:56 (UTC).

JOSEPH V BOCCAFOLA ESTATE OF et al v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 JOSEPH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BOCCAFOLA ESTATE OF. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Nassau Dcm-Tj. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Nassau Dcm-Tj

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph V Boccafola ESTATE OF

Defendants

DAP, INC

ITT LLC., Individually and as successor to Bell & Gossett and as successor to Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Co., Inc.,

WEIL-MCLAIN, a division of The Marley-Wylain Company, a wholly owned subsidiary of The Marley Company, LLC,

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, INC

KARNAK CORPORATION

THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL),

PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER),

EATON CORPORATION , as successor -in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

COMPUDYNE CORPORATION, Individually, and as successor to York Shipley, Inc.

THE FAIRBANKS COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc, / Bendix

PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC

CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation,

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris, Inc.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DREKSLER, ADAM SEAN

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

CALCAGNO, TERANCE ROWE

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

CAREATHERS, BENJAMIN LOWELL

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY LLC

FISHER, DAVID JONATHAN

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

REINHARDT, JUSTIN ALEXANDRE

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

DIGREGORIO, JOSEPH

Attorney at Barry, McTiernan & Moore

LYNCH, JAMES R.

Attorney at LYNCH DASKAL EMERY LLP

GAGLIARDI, DANIEL JOHN

Attorney at LYNCH DASKAL EMERY LLP

RYAN, JODIE L.

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

WATT, LAUREN ALYSE

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

Other Attorneys

Regev, Elissa

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

HWANG, ANNA

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg

CARNI, URIEL SHMAYA

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd.

CHEN, AMY YINGHONG

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

HOLLMAN, LAURA B.

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS

BLADEL, CHRISTOPHER BRIAN

Attorney at Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott, LLC

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Gleber, E.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) DBMP LLC's Notice of Bankruptcy Filing, Stay of Proceedings, and Entry of Temporary Restraining Orde ... show more

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) DBMP LLC's Notice of Bankruptcy Filing, Stay of Proceedings, and Entry of Temporary Restraining Orde ... show more; Filed By: Friesz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #002) *Corrected* RE: Motion Seq. Numbers 002, 003-005, 007: Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, D&O, Proof of ... show more

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #002) *Corrected* RE: Motion Seq. Numbers 002, 003-005, 007: Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, D&O, Proof of ... show more; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Domco's Letter to All Parties with 3101(d) Disclosure

PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Domco's Letter to All Parties with 3101(d) Disclosure; Filed By: Digregorio, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE American Biltrite Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion for Pro Hac Admission of Jeffery M. Odom

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE American Biltrite Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion for Pro Hac Admission of Jeffery M. Odom; Filed By: Reinhardt, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003); Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #007) Notice of Entry on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #007) Notice of Entry on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) AMENDED Notice of Entry for Order granting American Biltrite Inc.'s MSJ

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) AMENDED Notice of Entry for Order granting American Biltrite Inc.'s MSJ; Filed By: Reinhardt, J.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005) Mannington Mills, Inc.'s Notice of Entry of Order granting summary judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005) Mannington Mills, Inc.'s Notice of Entry of Order granting summary judgment; Filed By: Carni, U.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

ANSWER

Defendant, Domco Products Texas, Inc.'s Verified Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Eaton's Answer

ANSWER

Eaton Corporation

ANSWER

Pfizer's Verified Answer

ANSWER

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

Georgia-Pacific LLC's Verified Answer and Cross-Claims

ANSWER

Verified Answer on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company

ANSWER

CompuDyne's Answer

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

272 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Gleber, E.; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) DBMP LLC's Notice of Bankruptcy Filing, Stay of Proceedings, and Entry of Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Friesz, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #002) *Corrected* RE: Motion Seq. Numbers 002, 003-005, 007: Notice of Appeal, Informational Statement, D&O, Proof of Service; Filed By: Comerford, T.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Domco's Letter to All Parties with 3101(d) Disclosure; Filed By: Digregorio, J.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE American Biltrite Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion for Pro Hac Admission of Jeffery M. Odom; Filed By: Reinhardt, J.; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003); Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #007) Notice of Entry on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) AMENDED Notice of Entry for Order granting American Biltrite Inc.'s MSJ; Filed By: Reinhardt, J.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005) Mannington Mills, Inc.'s Notice of Entry of Order granting summary judgment; Filed By: Carni, U.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry for Order granting American Biltrite Inc.'s MSJ; Filed By: Reinhardt, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
264 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 07/01/2017; Received: 07/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Defendant, Domco Products Texas, Inc.'s Verified Answer; Filed By: Halbardier, S.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Eaton's Answer; Filed By: Ryan, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Eaton Corporation; Filed By: Ryan, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Pfizer's Verified Answer; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Calcagno, T.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Georgia-Pacific LLC's Verified Answer and Cross-Claims; Filed By: Regev, E.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company; Filed By: Bladel, C.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER CompuDyne's Answer; Filed By: Prelvukaj, A.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Alvarado, P.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less