This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/26/2020 at 14:28:53 (UTC).

JOSEPH TURANO R et al - v. - Sutton Hill II, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 JOSEPH TURANO R filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sutton Hill II, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig S Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2018

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Craig S Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Regina Turano

Joseph Turano R

Defendants

MEAD SEALCOATING & PARKING LOT MAINTENANCE INC

SUTTON HILL II LLC

VALUE REALTY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RACE, GLENN MATTHEW

Attorney at Law Office of Glenn M. Race

Defendant Attorneys

APPELBAUM, JOEL R.

Attorney at Joel R. Appelbaum

MILLER, JAMES C.

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO

NAPOLI, ANTHONY M.

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO, LLP

BONA, THOMAS M

Attorney at THOMAS M BONA, P.C.

MILLER, JEFFREY TODD

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO, LLP

 

Court Documents

TRIAL DOCUMENTS

TRIAL DOCUMENTS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Engagement

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Engagement; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Engagement

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Engagement; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence to Judge Craig S. Brown

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence to Judge Craig S. Brown; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry with Decision & Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry with Decision & Order; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3) *Corrected*; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) S&C Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 03/21/2018; Received: 03/21/2018

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL DOCUMENTS; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Engagement; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Engagement; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence to Judge Craig S. Brown; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry with Decision & Order; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #3); Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #3) *Corrected*; Filed By: Napoli, A.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) S&C Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 05/17/2018; Received: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Race, G. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Race, G.; Filed: 03/21/2018; Received: 03/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less