This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 02:52:39 (UTC).

JOSEPH SORRENTI - v. - KIMCO GREENRIDGE 674 INC et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 JOSEPH SORRENTI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KIMCO GREENRIDGE 674 INC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Sorrenti

Defendants

KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION

PAVING ASSOCIATES LLC

KIMCO GREENRIDGE 674 INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMOND, BETH MICHELLE

Attorney at WILLIAM SCHWITZER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

YAPCHANYK, CHRISTOPHER M

Attorney at Eustace, Prezioso & Yapchanyk

LANTRY, BRENDAN THOMAS

Attorney at Menicucci Villa Cilmi PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #005)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Lantry, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #005) Paving Work Logs

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #005) Paving Work Logs; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) Certified Weather Report

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) Certified Weather Report; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #005) Kimco Paving Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #005) Kimco Paving Contract; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #005) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #005) Note of Issue; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #005) Depo Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #005) Depo Transcript; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #005) Kimco Depo Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #005) Kimco Depo Transcript; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) Plaintiff's Depo Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) Plaintiff's Depo Transcript; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) Paving Associates' Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) Paving Associates' Answer; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Lantry, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #005) Paving Work Logs; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) Certified Weather Report; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #005) Kimco Paving Contract; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #005) Note of Issue; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #005) Depo Transcript; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #005) Kimco Depo Transcript; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) Plaintiff's Depo Transcript; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) Paving Associates' Answer; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) Kimco Answer; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Yapchanyk, C.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 05/16/2017; Received: 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less