This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 03:06:24 (UTC).

Joseph Santora - v. - Mims Construction Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 Joseph Santora filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mims Construction Services, Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Santora

Defendants

William Deriso

Mims Construction Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANTORA, JOHN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. SANTORA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Lateness

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)

--none--

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT

--none--

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

Filed with Order on Motion Seq. 001

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Plaintiff's Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S)

Contract and checks

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons and Complaint and Affidavits of Service

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment with Bill of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Lateness; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Filed with Order on Motion Seq. 001; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 05/11/2018; Received: 05/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 05/11/2018; Received: 05/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/04/2018; Received: 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Contract and checks; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint and Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 02/15/2018; Received: 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 09/07/2017; Received: 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Santora, J.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less