This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/26/2020 at 12:42:20 (UTC).

JOSEPH RUSSELL et al - v. - CHARLTON D. ELLIS et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 JOSEPH RUSSELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHARLTON D ELLIS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A Onofry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2018

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A Onofry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Irene Nuss

Joseph Russell

Defendants

Charlton Ellis D

Nichole Ellis A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEKOWSKI, BRETT A

Attorney at PARKER WAICHMAN LLP

ROSENTHAL, FRED ROBERT

Attorney at PARKER WAICHMAN LLP

Defendant Attorney

MONAHAN, JAYNE FRANCES

Attorney at Burke, Conway & Dillon

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 09/18/2018; Received: 09/18/2018

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial intervention

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial intervention; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Attorney Certification

CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Attorney Certification; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for pc

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for pc; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

ANSWER Verified Answer with various demands

ANSWER Verified Answer with various demands; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenthal, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenthal, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenthal, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 11/06/2018; Received: 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 09/18/2018; Received: 09/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2018; Received: 08/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial intervention; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Attorney Certification; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for pc; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer with various demands; Filed By: Monahan, J.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rosenthal, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenthal, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rosenthal, F. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zekowski, B.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less