This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:38:01 (UTC).

Joseph Panarelli et al - v. - John Pelle et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Joseph Panarelli filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against John Pelle. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florence Delio seeger

Gloria Delio glickman

Anthony E. Delio

Angelo Bianculli

Theresa Bianculli cognitore

Madeline Pelle ribaudo

Madeline Pelle iovino

Anthony T. Delio

Ursula Delio

John J. Pelle

Joseph Panarelli

Michael Novello

Defendants

Diane Delio a/k/a Diane Klein

Donald Delio a/k/a Donald Klein

John Pelle

Jane Doe 1 through 100, the last 100 names being fictitious persons

John Doe 1 through 100, the last 100 names being fictitious persons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PASQUARIELLO, ANTONIO

Attorney at Carlinsky, Dunn & Pasquariello, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

KALISH, ADAM

Attorney at The Law Office of Adam Kalish P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER dtd 4/2/19 nsp.

ORDER - OTHER dtd 4/2/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

ORDER - OTHER dated 2/19/2019

ORDER - OTHER dated 2/19/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOI, Certificate of Readiness & Affirmation of Compliance

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOI, Certificate of Readiness & Affirmation of Compliance; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #5) dtd 1/9/19

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #5) dtd 1/9/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Angelo Bianculli

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Angelo Bianculli; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Madeline Pelle Iovino

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Madeline Pelle Iovino; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Madeline Pelle Ribaudo

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Madeline Pelle Ribaudo; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of John Joseph Pelle

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of John Joseph Pelle; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Michael Novello

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Michael Novello; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Joseph Panarelli

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Joseph Panarelli; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Eric Feinstein

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Eric Feinstein; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

154 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 4/2/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 2/19/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOI, Certificate of Readiness & Affirmation of Compliance; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #5) dtd 1/9/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Theresa Bianculli Cognitore; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Angelo Bianculli; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Madeline Pelle Iovino; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Madeline Pelle Ribaudo; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of John Joseph Pelle; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Michael Novello; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Joseph Panarelli; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Eric Feinstein; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Pasquariello, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less