This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 17:55:33 (UTC).

Joseph McMeo - v. - Apostolo Kousoulas

Case Summary

On 05/25/2017 Joseph McMeo filed an Other lawsuit against Apostolo Kousoulas. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Mcmeo

Defendant

Apostolo Kousoulas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEITELMAN, MARK E

Attorney at MARK E SEITELMAN LAW OFFICES, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

SHAPIRO, ADAM PHILIP

Attorney at Law Office of Karen L. Lawrence

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Vacate

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Vacate; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 11/2/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 11/2/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/06/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

ANSWER McMeo

ANSWER McMeo; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #1); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Vacate; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2018; Received: 05/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 11/2/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/06/2017; Received: 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER McMeo; Filed By: Shapiro, A.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 06/20/2017; Received: 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Seitelman, M.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less