This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 00:15:17 (UTC).

Joseph Locci - v. - Town of Dewitt

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 Joseph Locci filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Town of Dewitt. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2068

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Locci

Defendant

Town of Dewitt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUATTROCCI, ROBERT ALAN

Attorney at Stanley Law Offices, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

WELCH, TIMOTHY PAUL

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine P.C.

RUSSO, ALAN S

Attorney at RUSSO & TONER LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI); Filed By: Welch, T.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Extended discovery deadlines

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Extended discovery deadlines; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Re Scheduling Order Amendment

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Re Scheduling Order Amendment; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence regarding case status

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence regarding case status; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Discovery Conference on 10-17-18 at 11:00 a.m.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Discovery Conference on 10-17-18 at 11:00 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) PCSO

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) PCSO; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Compliance Conference on 3-4-19 at 10:00 a.m.

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Compliance Conference on 3-4-19 at 10:00 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for July 2, 2018.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for July 2, 2018.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

NOTICE This Part does NOT require working copies.

NOTICE This Part does NOT require working copies.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Russo, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI); Filed By: Welch, T.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Extended discovery deadlines; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Re Scheduling Order Amendment; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 03/01/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Correspondence regarding case status; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1) Discovery Conference on 10-17-18 at 11:00 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) PCSO; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Discovery Demands; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 09/06/2018; Received: 09/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Compliance Conference on 3-4-19 at 10:00 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Preliminary Conference scheduled for July 2, 2018.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/30/2018; Received: 05/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE This Part does NOT require working copies.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/25/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Russo, A.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Quattrocci, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less