Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 05:06:52 (UTC).

JOSEPH KOWALCZYK et al v. AERCO INTERNATIONAL et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 JOSEPH KOWALCZYK filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AERCO INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel J. Mendez. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel J. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Kowalczyk

Defendants

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., and as successor-in-interest to THE BENDIX CORPORATION

TRANE U.S. INC., f/k/a AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., Individually, and as successor in interest to KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

PEERLESS INDUSTRIES INC.

KAMCO SUPPLY CORP.

AERCO INTERNATIONAL

WEIL-McLAIN, A DIVISION OF THE MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

AMERICAN BILTRITE, Individually and as successor to AMTICO FLOORS

EMPIRE-ACE INSULATION MFG. CORP.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

Genuine Parts Company

Plastics Engineering Company, individually and as successor to PLENCO

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, individually

NAPA AUTO PARTS, a/k/a NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION

GOODYEAR CANADA, INC.

Rogers Corporation

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, JOSEPH PATRICK

Attorney at THE WILLIAMS LAW FIRM, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

PUGLIESE, DONALD R

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

PASCARELLA, LISA M.

Attorney at PASCARELLA DIVITA LINDENBAUM & TOMASZEWSKI

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

KATES, ANDREW PHILIP

Attorney at SEGAL MCCAMBRIDGE SINGER & MAHONEY, LTD.

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

FISHER, DAVID JONATHAN

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

REINHARDT, JUSTIN ALEXANDRE

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

ZISK, ERIC MICHAEL

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

CULLINANE, KAREN ANN

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

SCHOLZ, ANDREW J

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

Other Attorneys

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

DIMARCO, ERIK CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

SQUITIERI, VIRGINIA PAULA

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

St John, Terrence P

Attorney at HEIDELL PITTONI MURPHY & BACH LLP

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

POPE, MICHELLE ANETTE

Attorney at Clyde and Co

ANGIOLILLO, JOSEPH M

Attorney at Cullen & Dykman LLP

YOUNG, CINDY

Attorney at Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Honeywell/Bendix

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Honeywell/Bendix; Filed By: Pugliese, D.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Partial USJM for Loss of Consortium on behalf Dap

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Partial USJM for Loss of Consortium on behalf Dap; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) DAP, Inc. - Partial Unopposed Summary Judgment as to LOC Claim

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) DAP, Inc. - Partial Unopposed Summary Judgment as to LOC Claim; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) NAPA Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) NAPA Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Marlette, P.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) GPC Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) GPC Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Marlette, P.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.; Filed By: Minot, A.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Peerless - Acknowledgment of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Peerless - Acknowledgment of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer; Filed By: O'Rourke, P.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Williams, J.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

229 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Honeywell/Bendix; Filed By: Pugliese, D.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Partial USJM for Loss of Consortium on behalf Dap; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) DAP, Inc. - Partial Unopposed Summary Judgment as to LOC Claim; Filed By: Cook, K.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) NAPA Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Marlette, P.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) GPC Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Marlette, P.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.; Filed By: Minot, A.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Gates Corp.; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Williams, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Peerless - Acknowledgment of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer; Filed By: O'Rourke, P.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Williams, J.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less