This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:54:54 (UTC).

JOSEPH ELIE FRANCOIS v. SUZE DAMOR

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 JOSEPH ELIE FRANCOIS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SUZE DAMOR. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Elie Francois

Defendant

Suze Damor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGRATH, DENNIS J.

Attorney at Aronow Law

Defendant Attorney

KLEIN, ALEX DANIEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 01/26/2020; Received: 01/26/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dated 11/27/19

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dated 11/27/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Emails denying additional 30 days

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Emails denying additional 30 days; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Emails Granting Original Extension

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Emails Granting Original Extension; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Plaintiff Releases Defendant

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Plaintiff Releases Defendant; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Verified Answer with Counter Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Verified Answer with Counter Claim; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) email

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) email; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G 5/26/10 refinance for 105th Street

EXHIBIT(S) - G 5/26/10 refinance for 105th Street; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F 9/7/04 Mortgage for $210,000 on 105th Street

EXHIBIT(S) - F 9/7/04 Mortgage for $210,000 on 105th Street; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Valuation of properties as per Realtor.com

EXHIBIT(S) - E Valuation of properties as per Realtor.com; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ira Grabstock Notarized Forms dated after death of signer

EXHIBIT(S) - D Ira Grabstock Notarized Forms dated after death of signer; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Transfer of 105th Street Property after Death of Marie Francois

EXHIBIT(S) - C Transfer of 105th Street Property after Death of Marie Francois; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Transfer of 84th Street Property

EXHIBIT(S) - B Transfer of 84th Street Property; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Marie Francois Death Certificate

EXHIBIT(S) - A Marie Francois Death Certificate; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 01/26/2020; Received: 01/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dated 11/27/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Emails denying additional 30 days; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Emails Granting Original Extension; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Plaintiff Releases Defendant; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Verified Answer with Counter Claim; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) email; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Emails; Filed By: Klein, A.; Filed: 11/06/2019; Received: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H 3/26/16 Loan against 105th Street; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G 5/26/10 refinance for 105th Street; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F 9/7/04 Mortgage for $210,000 on 105th Street; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Valuation of properties as per Realtor.com; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Ira Grabstock Notarized Forms dated after death of signer; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Transfer of 105th Street Property after Death of Marie Francois; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Transfer of 84th Street Property; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Marie Francois Death Certificate; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Mcgrath, D.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less