This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 20:41:33 (UTC).

JOSEPH DICARLO v. JAMESTOWN 450 WEST 15TH STREET, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 JOSEPH DICARLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JAMESTOWN 450 WEST 15TH STREET, L P. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris Ling-Cohan and Verna L Saunders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judges

Doris Ling-Cohan

Verna L Saunders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Dicarlo

Defendants and Petitioners

CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,

CONSOLIDATED EDISON, INC.,

JAMESTOWN 450 WEST 15TH STREET, L.P.

AMA CONSULTING ENGINEERS, P.C.,

AMA DESIGN BUILD,

Respondent

PRECISION PIPELINE SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAGHAB, ROY RAYMOND

Attorney at JAGHAB, JAGHAB & JAGHAB, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL JOSEPH MCNULTY

Defendant Attorneys

MCNULTY, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at CON EDISON LAW DEPT

LITTMAN, MATTHEW IAN

Attorney at Bartlett LLP

CORREIA, DOREEN J

Attorney at Correia, King, McGinnis & Liferiedge

TOOMEY, JAMES J

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES J. TOOMEY

Respondent Attorney

MATTHEW IAN LITTMAN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IN SUBMISSIONS PART - RM 130 (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IN SUBMISSIONS PART - RM 130 (Motion #001); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of AMA DESIGN BUILD, LLCs general liability insurance policy

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of AMA DESIGN BUILD, LLCs general liability insurance policy; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract between JAMESTOWN 450 WEST 15TH STREET, L.P and AMA DESIGN BUILD, LLC Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract between JAMESTOWN 450 WEST 15TH STREET, L.P and AMA DESIGN BUILD, LLC Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Letter; Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Notice for D & I

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Notice for D & I; Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Mcnulty, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demands

DEMAND FOR: Demands; Filed By: Mcnulty, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer And Cross-Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer And Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Mcnulty, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IN SUBMISSIONS PART - RM 130 (Motion #001); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of AMA DESIGN BUILD, LLCs general liability insurance policy; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract between JAMESTOWN 450 WEST 15TH STREET, L.P and AMA DESIGN BUILD, LLC Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Toomey, J.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Letter; Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Notice for D & I; Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 05/20/2020; Received: 05/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Correia, D.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Mcnulty, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demands; Filed By: Mcnulty, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer And Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Mcnulty, M. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Jaghab, R.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less