This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 02:48:05 (UTC).

Joseph Barone - v. - Bausch & Lomb, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 Joseph Barone filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bausch Lomb, Inc. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Piampiano. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0711

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Piampiano

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Barone

Defendants

Morcher GmbH

FCI Ophthalmics, Inc.

Bausch & Lomb, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIPARI, JOSEPH

Attorney at The Sultzer Law Group, P.C.

FRANCIS, JEREMY BRADFORD

Attorney at The Sultzer Law Group

Defendant Attorneys

BEIERSDORF, OLIVER K.

Attorney at REED SMITH, LLP

Waldow, Arnd von

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

MARKLEY, ALENA MICHELE

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

RICHARDSON, SARAH HOLT

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

KIRSHENBERG, ROBERT JAY

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

SMULIAN, DANIEL

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #7)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #7); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/08/2020

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #7) Notice of Settlement of Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #7) Notice of Settlement of Order; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Be So Ordered To Extend Discovery Deadlines

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Be So Ordered To Extend Discovery Deadlines; Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #7)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #7); Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #7) Opp to Morcher MTD

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #7) Opp to Morcher MTD; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #7) Safety-Effectiveness Data

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #7) Safety-Effectiveness Data; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #7) Premarket Approval

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #7) Premarket Approval; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #7) RFPs

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #7) RFPs; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #7) Notice of Appeal

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #7) Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Naylon, P.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Tiime for Defendant Bausch & Lomb, Inc. to answer, move, plead or otherwise re ... show more

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Tiime for Defendant Bausch & Lomb, Inc. to answer, move, plead or otherwise re ... show more; Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Naylon, P.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time for Bausch & Lom, Inc. to answer, move, plead or otherwise respond to Pla ... show more

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time for Bausch & Lom, Inc. to answer, move, plead or otherwise respond to Pla ... show more; Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #7); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #7) Notice of Settlement of Order; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation to Be So Ordered To Extend Discovery Deadlines; Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #7); Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #7) Opp to Morcher MTD; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #7) Safety-Effectiveness Data; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #7) Premarket Approval; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #7) RFPs; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #7) Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #7) Trial Court Order; Filed By: Beiersdorf, O.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Naylon, P.; Filed: 07/11/2017; Received: 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Tiime for Defendant Bausch & Lomb, Inc. to answer, move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Naylon, P.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time for Bausch & Lom, Inc. to answer, move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 7/12/17; Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Smulian, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Lipari, J.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less