This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:17:19 (UTC).

Jose Ramos v. Pepe Joe's Brick Oven Pizza et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Jose Ramos filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Pepe Joe's Brick Oven Pizza. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison Y Tuitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Alison Y Tuitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Ramos

Defendants

Pepe Joe's Brick Oven Pizza

Silvestre Caamano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Moriarty, Russell Scott

Attorney at Levine & Blit, PLLC

SLUTSKY, AMANDA BROOKE

Attorney at Levine & Blit, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

NEGRON, WANDA YVETTE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WANDA Y. NEGRON, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 1/29/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 1/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

DEMAND FOR: First Demand for Production of Documents

DEMAND FOR: First Demand for Production of Documents; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 9/18/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 9/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

AFFIRMATION of Actual Engagement

AFFIRMATION of Actual Engagement; Filed By: Moriarty, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting adjournment of conference

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting adjournment of conference; Filed By: Moriarty, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 04/17/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 04/17/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Moriarty, R.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 1/29/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: First Demand for Production of Documents; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 9/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION of Actual Engagement; Filed By: Moriarty, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Requesting adjournment of conference; Filed By: Moriarty, R.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 5/6/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 04/17/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Slutsky, A.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Negron, W.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Moriarty, R.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less