Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 02:49:14 (UTC).

Jose Quito v. 85 Broad Street Property Owner, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Jose Quito filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 85 Broad Street Property Owner, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Quito

Defendants and Petitioners

Vanguard Construction and Development Company, Inc.

85 Broad Street Property Owner, LLC

IC US Capital Properties LLC

Respondent

RITE-WAY INTERNAL REMOVAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORESKY, JACOB

Attorney at ORESKY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

Petitioner Attorney

DOUGLAS JORDAN DOMSKY

Defendant Attorneys

DOMSKY, DOUGLAS JORDAN

Attorney at Hannum, Feretic, Prendergast & Merlino, LLC

SISKIND, LESLEY C

Attorney at Cartafalsa Turpin & Lenoff

GITNIK, BRIAN STUART

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO, LLP

TORKIVER, ARTHUR GREGORY

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 01/13/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 01/13/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gitnik, B.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Prior Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Prior Pleadings; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third Party Summons and Complaint

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third Party Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

ANSWER Answer to Complaint

ANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

ANSWER Deft. - 85 Broad Street, IC US Capital Properties Answer

ANSWER Deft. - 85 Broad Street, IC US Capital Properties Answer; Filed By: Siskind, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Service Upon the Secretary of State

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Service Upon the Secretary of State; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Def. IC US Capital Properties LLC affidavit of service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Def. IC US Capital Properties LLC affidavit of service; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT Def. Vanguard Construction and Development Company, Inc.

AFFIDAVIT Def. Vanguard Construction and Development Company, Inc.; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT Def. 85 Broad Street Property Owner LLC affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT Def. 85 Broad Street Property Owner LLC affidavit of service; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 01/13/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gitnik, B.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Prior Pleadings; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third Party Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce Retainer Agreement; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand Pursuant to CPLR 4545; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Domsky, D.; Filed: 07/08/2019; Received: 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Deft. - 85 Broad Street, IC US Capital Properties Answer; Filed By: Siskind, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Service Upon the Secretary of State; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Def. IC US Capital Properties LLC affidavit of service; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Def. Vanguard Construction and Development Company, Inc.; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Def. 85 Broad Street Property Owner LLC affidavit of service; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Oresky, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less