Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 03:11:05 (UTC).

JOSE LINARES v. BIG DREAM DEVELOPERS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 JOSE LINARES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BIG DREAM DEVELOPERS LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Wavny Toussaint. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Wavny Toussaint

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Linares

Defendants

BIG DREAM DEVELOPERS LLC

M CARROLL LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIAKAS, STEPHEN JOHN

Attorney at Liakas Law, P.C.

DELISO, ANTHONY MICHAEL

Attorney at Liakas Law PC

LIAKAS, DEAN NICHOLAS

Attorney at Liakas Law PC

Defendant Attorneys

PERKEL, STEVEN ROSS

Attorney at Ahmuty, Demers & McManus, Esqs.

ALLEN, MONIQUE ANTIONETTE

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

EDWARDS, JAMES

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

MUOIO, MEGAN JEANE

Attorney at ALLYN & FORTUNA, LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) ADR Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) ADR Order; Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Combined Demands on Plaintiff

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Combined Demands on Plaintiff; Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit in support

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit in support; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) M Carroll's Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) M Carroll's Answer; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order dated 09/24/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order dated 09/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Edwards, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Liakas, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Liakas, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Liakas, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Liakas, D.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) ADR Order; Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Combined Demands on Plaintiff; Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit in support; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) M Carroll's Answer; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Answer; Filed By: Perkel, S.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Defendants; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order dated 09/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Muoio, M.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Edwards, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Liakas, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Liakas, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Liakas, S. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/08/2019; Received: 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Liakas, D.; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less