Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 21:05:09 (UTC).

Jose Hernandez-Ramirez - v. - 150-13 89th, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 Jose Hernandez-Ramirez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 150-13 89th, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Hernandez-ramirez

Defendants and Petitioners

Blue Rock Construction, Inc.

150-13 89th, LLC.

Respondent

LDJ CONTRACTING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIMONELLI, GINA MARIE

Attorney at Toresco and Simonelli PC

HURWITZ, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at Block OToole Murphy LLP

Petitioner Attorney

LEONARD MICHAEL CASCONE (04599DCSC)

Defendant Attorneys

CASCONE, LEONARD MICHAEL

Attorney at CASCONE & KLUEPFEL, LLP

MCMANUS, COURTNEY A.

Attorney at Ahmuty, Demers & McManus

COLAMEO, THOMAS J

Attorney at AHMUTY DEMERS & MCMANUS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) order dtd 1/6/2020 signed by Hon. Colon

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) order dtd 1/6/2020 signed by Hon. Colon; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #1) Exhibit 11 Email

EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #1) Exhibit 11 Email; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #1) Exhibit 10 EBT Def. 150-13 89th 11.21.2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #1) Exhibit 10 EBT Def. 150-13 89th 11.21.2019; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #1) Exhibit 9 P. EBT 11.21.2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #1) Exhibit 9 P. EBT 11.21.2019; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) Exhibit 8 Pre-Final NOte Order 11.15.2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) Exhibit 8 Pre-Final NOte Order 11.15.2019; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Colameo, T.; Filed: 03/28/2018; Received: 03/28/2018

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claim

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Colameo, T.; Filed: 03/28/2018; Received: 03/28/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) order dtd 1/6/2020 signed by Hon. Colon; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #1) Exhibit 11 Email; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #1) Exhibit 10 EBT Def. 150-13 89th 11.21.2019; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #1) Exhibit 9 P. EBT 11.21.2019; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) Exhibit 8 Pre-Final NOte Order 11.15.2019; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 07/05/2018; Received: 07/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 04/06/2018; Received: 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Colameo, T.; Filed: 03/28/2018; Received: 03/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Colameo, T.; Filed: 03/28/2018; Received: 03/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Cascone, L.; Filed: 12/21/2017; Received: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 08/10/2017; Received: 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Simonelli, G.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less