Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 16:39:51 (UTC).

Jose E. Villalobos - v. - 353-357 Broadway LLC.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 Jose E Villalobos filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 353-357 Broadway LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose E. Villalobos

Defendant

353-357 Broadway LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRELICH, GLORIA

Attorney at DAVID HOROWITZ, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

FULLERTON, EILEEN R

Attorney at Fullerton Beck, LLP

BERNSTEIN, ROBERT S

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dtd 11/9/18 nsp

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dtd 11/9/18 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D - Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D - Note of Issue; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C - Final Pre-Note Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C - Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Answer; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Vacate

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Vacate; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 09/19/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

ORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part - dated 4/11/18

ORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part - dated 4/11/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 10/11/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 10/11/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavits of Service and Legal Back

AFFIDAVIT Affidavits of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH

AFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer to Second Amended Verified Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer to Second Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Bernstein, R.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C Served Upon 353-357 Broadway, LLC.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C Served Upon 353-357 Broadway, LLC.; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Second Amended Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Second Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 02/01/2019; Received: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dtd 11/9/18 nsp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D - Note of Issue; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C - Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Answer; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Vacate; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 09/19/2018; Received: 09/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 9/14/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/18/2018; Received: 09/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney; Filed By: Fullerton, E.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part - dated 4/11/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/13/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 10/11/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavits of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Second Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Bernstein, R.; Filed: 07/03/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of S&C Served Upon 353-357 Broadway, LLC.; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Second Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Drelich, G.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less