This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 08:33:50 (UTC).

Jose Cedeno et al - v. - Hibernia Construction, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 Jose Cedeno filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hibernia Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Antonio I Brandveen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Antonio I Brandveen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelvin De los santos

Jose Cedeno

Defendants

Mark Russell

Hibernia Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN, BRETT R.

Attorney at LEEDS BROWN LAW, P.C.

ALESANDRO, ANTHONY MICHAEL

Attorney at Leeds Brown Law, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

BARDAVID, JONATHAN MICHAEL

Attorney at DANIELS, PORCO AND LUSARDI, LLP

MULLER, ARTHUR JOSEPH

Attorney at TRIVELLA & FORTE, LLP

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Filed By: Alesandro, A.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002); Filed By: Bardavid, J.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/02/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation Adjourning Conference

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation Adjourning Conference; Filed By: Bardavid, J. - filed by Mead, L.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/02/2020

STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Motion #002) Stipulation

STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Motion #002) Stipulation; Filed By: Bardavid, J. - filed by Mead, L.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Stipulation Adjourning Return Date

STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Stipulation Adjourning Return Date; Filed By: Bardavid, J. - filed by Mead, L.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Sampling of Putative Class Pay and Time Records

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Sampling of Putative Class Pay and Time Records; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Named Plaintiffs Pay and Time Records

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Named Plaintiffs Pay and Time Records; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Proposed Notice of W&H Class Action Lawsuit

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Proposed Notice of W&H Class Action Lawsuit; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Plaintiffs' Affirmation of Brett R. Cohen, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Discovery Relief and To Compel Disclosures

NOTICE OF MOTION

Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Discovery Relief and to Compel Disclosures

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

STIPULATION - OTHER

Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion For Class Certification

ANSWER

Answer to Class Action Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Complaint

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Filed By: Alesandro, A.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002); Filed By: Bardavid, J.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation Adjourning Conference; Filed By: Bardavid, J. - filed by Mead, L.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Motion #002) Stipulation; Filed By: Bardavid, J. - filed by Mead, L.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Stipulation Adjourning Return Date; Filed By: Bardavid, J. - filed by Mead, L.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Sampling of Putative Class Pay and Time Records; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Named Plaintiffs Pay and Time Records; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Proposed Notice of W&H Class Action Lawsuit; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Proposed Publication Order; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Ex. A - Preliminary Conference Order (Doc. No. 7, as filed via NYSCEF); Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Affirmation of Brett R. Cohen, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Discovery Relief and To Compel Disclosures; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Discovery Relief and to Compel Disclosures; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2018; Received: 11/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion For Class Certification; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Class Action Complaint; Filed By: Bardavid, J.; Filed: 02/02/2018; Received: 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Cohen, B.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less