This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 14:09:47 (UTC).

Jose Aurelio Moreno-Chavez - v. - Maria Elena Cantarero et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 Jose Aurelio Moreno-Chavez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Maria Elena Cantarero. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Aurelio Moreno-chavez

Defendants

Jessica Cantarero

Maria Elena Cantarero

Meadowbrook Financial Mortgage Bankers, Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GILLIAM, QUENTEN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Friedman Vartolo LLP

WEATHERS, WENDY M

Attorney at CABANILLAS & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

FRIEDMAN, DANIEL

Attorney at Daniel Friedman, Esq.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Dated 1/14/20

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Dated 1/14/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

INTERROGATORIES Defendants' Interrogatories to Plaintiff

INTERROGATORIES Defendants' Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) WebCivil Appearance Detail

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) WebCivil Appearance Detail; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Final Court Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Final Court Order; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Decision and Order dtd 4/12/18

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Decision and Order dtd 4/12/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - L Email

EXHIBIT(S) - L Email; Filed By: Weathers, W. - filed by Cabanillas & Associates; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - K Final Pre-Note Order

EXHIBIT(S) - K Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: Weathers, W. - filed by Cabanillas & Associates; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Jessica Cantarero

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Jessica Cantarero; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Maria Cantarero

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Maria Cantarero; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Meadowbrook Financial Mortgage

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Meadowbrook Financial Mortgage; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Dated 1/14/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES Defendants' Interrogatories to Plaintiff; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) WebCivil Appearance Detail; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Final Court Order; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Decision and Order dtd 4/12/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L Email; Filed By: Weathers, W. - filed by Cabanillas & Associates; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K Final Pre-Note Order; Filed By: Weathers, W. - filed by Cabanillas & Associates; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Weathers, W. - filed by Cabanillas & Associates; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit of Maria Cantarero; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Friedman, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Jessica Cantarero; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Maria Cantarero; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Meadowbrook Financial Mortgage; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Gilliam, Q. - filed by Nashike; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less