This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 09/26/2023 at 03:08:39 (UTC).

JONATHAN TOLIVER et al v. CARLOS TORRES et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 JONATHAN TOLIVER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS TORRES. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Bronx, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********023E

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jonathan Toliver

Rondell Mciver

Defendants

Carlos Torres

METROPOLITAN SEWER, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMEN, ALAN

Defendant Attorney

FENDT, ERIC GARY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Carlos Torres

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Carlos Torres; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 02/03/2023; Received: 02/03/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Defendant- Metropolitan Sewer, Inc.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Defendant- Metropolitan Sewer, Inc.; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 02/10/2023; Received: 02/10/2023

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/02/2023; Received: 03/02/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/02/2023; Received: 03/02/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/02/2023; Received: 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 03/02/2023; Received: 03/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS- Defendant- Metropolitan Sewer, Inc.; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 02/10/2023; Received: 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Carlos Torres; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 02/03/2023; Received: 02/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Blumen, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less