Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 11:56:23 (UTC).

JONATHAN KANER - v. - LEGACY YARDS TENANT LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 JONATHAN KANER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LEGACY YARDS TENANT LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P Nervo. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank P Nervo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Kaner

Defendants

LEGACY YARDS TENANT LLC

TUTOR PERINI BUILDING CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PLATZ, HARLAN A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HARLAN A. PLATZ, P.L.L.C.

FANNING, DOUGLAS J.

Attorney at Law Office of Douglas J. Fanning, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

EFSTATHIOU, ARIANNA

Attorney at MORRIS DUFFY ALONSO & FALEY

RIOS DUFFY, DORIS

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

Stipulation of Discontinuance

COURT NOTICE

--none--

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Letter advising the Court that case settled.

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IN SUBMISSIONS PART - RM 130

Stip 2 w.draw

EXHIBIT(S)

Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

DEMAND FOR:

PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED DEMANDS

BILL OF PARTICULARS

VBP & RESPONSES TO COMBINED DEMANDS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

All defendants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS - Tutor Perini

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Rios Duffy, D.; Filed: 02/07/2020; Received: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter advising the Court that case settled.; Filed By: Platz, H.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IN SUBMISSIONS PART - RM 130 (Motion #001) Stip 2 w.draw; Filed By: Efstathiou, A.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Platz, H.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Stipulation to Adjourn Motion; Filed By: Platz, H.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2018; Received: 03/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS VBP & RESPONSES TO COMBINED DEMANDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 12/28/2017; Received: 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Johnson, P.; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Johnson, P.; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE All defendants; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Tutor Perini; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fanning, D.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less