This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 00:49:55 (UTC).

JOHN STASIO - v. - VORNADO FOREST PLAZA LLC.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 JOHN STASIO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VORNADO FOREST PLAZA LLC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Stasio

Defendant

VORNADO FOREST PLAZA LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVA, GEORGE

Attorney at BISOGNO & MEYERSON

Defendant Attorneys

REGENSBURG, GREGORY PAUL

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP

DELL, GREGORY JOSEPH

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - 325(d)

ORDER - 325(d); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service with BlueBack

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service with BlueBack; Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #002) Order Sent to Plaintiff and Defendant's Attorney

ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #002) Order Sent to Plaintiff and Defendant's Attorney; Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #002); Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2018; Received: 11/26/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Regensburg, G.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Regensburg, G.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Dell, G.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Dell, G.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - 325(d); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service with BlueBack; Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #002) Order Sent to Plaintiff and Defendant's Attorney; Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #002); Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002); Filed By: Silva, G.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2018; Received: 11/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001); Filed By: Regensburg, G.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Regensburg, G.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Regensburg, G.; Filed: 02/05/2018; Received: 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Dell, G.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Dell, G.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Deliso, A.; Filed: 04/27/2017; Received: 04/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less