This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 12:46:04 (UTC).

John Smith v. Justin Pawlowski et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 John Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Justin Pawlowski. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Smith

Defendants

Justin Pawlowski

Tyrina Koehler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEINER, RICHARD JAY

Attorney at STEINER & BLOTNIK

Defendant Attorneys

DUNBAR, JOSEPH W.

Attorney at GIBSON, McASKILL & CROSBY, LLP

D'ANGELO, TIFFANY LEE

Attorney at Allstate Staff Counsel

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

DEMAND FOR: Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief

DEMAND FOR: Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

DEMAND FOR: Medicare/Medicaid Lien Information

DEMAND FOR: Medicare/Medicaid Lien Information; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery Demands; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Medicare/Medicaid Lien Information; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Omnibus Discovery Demands; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Dunbar, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT; Filed By: D'Angelo, T.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Steiner, R.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less