This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 00:20:47 (UTC).

JOHN BOYLE et al v. SOUTH SHORE SWIMMING CLUB, INC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 JOHN BOYLE filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTH SHORE SWIMMING CLUB, INC. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne Ozzi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne Ozzi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Boyle individually

John Boyle as Father and Guardian of

Kate Boyle a Minor Child

Defendant

SOUTH SHORE SWIMMING CLUB, INC d/b/a SOUTH SHORE SWIM CLUB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALEADY, JAMES ADRIAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES MALEADY ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

LANZO, FRANK CARMELO

Attorney at MIRANDA SLONE SKLARIN VERVENIOTIS LLP

SLONE, ONDINE

Attorney at MIRANDA SAMBURSKY SLONE SKLARIN VERVENIOTIS LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Slone, O.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Maleady, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lanzo, F.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Maleady, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Lanzo, F.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Maleady, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Slone, O.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lanzo, F.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Lanzo, F.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Maleady, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Maleady, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Maleady, J.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less