This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:39:07 (UTC).

Joel Alcock - v. - Karen Stradford

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Joel Alcock filed an Other lawsuit against Karen Stradford. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joel Alcock

Defendant

Karen Stradford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT, RICHARD JOHN

Attorney at The Law Offices of Richard Wright PLLC

Defendant Attorney

SAFER, JESSE A.

Attorney at JAMES G. BILELLO & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wright, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

ANSWER Verified Answer with Demands

ANSWER Verified Answer with Demands; Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wright, R.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer with Demands; Filed By: Safer, J. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 08/29/2017; Received: 08/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wright, R.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wright, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less