This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:51:14 (UTC).

Jodi Tunison - v. - Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Jodi Tunison filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jodi Tunison as a signee of Patricia Hebert

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORBERG, DAVID J.

Defendant Attorney

RUSSELL, PAUL K

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation

EXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Power of Attorney Designation

EXHIBIT(S) - B Power of Attorney Designation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

DEMAND FOR: Production of Documents

DEMAND FOR: Production of Documents; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation

EXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation

EXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Production of Documents; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Russell, P.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Power of Attorney Designation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gorberg, D.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less