This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 05/20/2023 at 13:35:24 (UTC).

Jock Symonds v. CHARLES GARLOCK & SONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Jock Symonds filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHARLES GARLOCK SONS, INC. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2849

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jock Symonds

Defendant

CHARLES GARLOCK & SONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEIROWITZ, SAMUEL MILES

Defendant Attorney

GORIS, MARK DANIEL

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

--none--

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 12/02/2022; Received: 12/02/2022

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2022; Received: 12/02/2022

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI); Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/26/2022; Received: 09/26/2022

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/06/2022; Received: 04/06/2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 04/05/2022; Received: 04/05/2022

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference April 5, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference April 5, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2022; Received: 03/15/2022

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 03/04/2022; Received: 03/04/2022

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

DEMAND FOR: Medicare Demand

DEMAND FOR: Medicare Demand; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Charles Garlock & Sons Inc

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Charles Garlock & Sons Inc; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 11/16/2021; Received: 11/16/2021

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 04/24/2023; Received: 04/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/21/2023; Received: 04/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 12/02/2022; Received: 12/02/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2022; Received: 12/02/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI); Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/26/2022; Received: 09/26/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/06/2022; Received: 04/06/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 04/05/2022; Received: 04/05/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference April 5, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2022; Received: 03/15/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 03/04/2022; Received: 03/04/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Medicare Demand; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Goris, M.; Filed: 02/01/2022; Received: 02/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Charles Garlock & Sons Inc; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 11/16/2021; Received: 11/16/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 11/01/2021; Received: 11/01/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less