This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 17:56:21 (UTC).

Joanne Krytus - v. - City of Buffalo et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 Joanne Krytus filed an Other lawsuit against City of Buffalo. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joanne Krytus

Defendants

John Doe and Jane Roe Being Police Officers of the City of Buffalo Police Department, whose identities are not yet known

City of Buffalo

City of Buffalo Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LORENZ, WILLIAM ARCONA

Attorney at HoganWillig

COHEN, STEVEN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOGAN WILLIG

KUJAWA, REBECCA MARGARET

Attorney at HOGAN WILLIG, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

HUGGINS, MAEVE EILEEN

Attorney at City of Buffalo Department of Law Corporation Counsel's Office

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEAL

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

--none--

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Complaint Summary Report

EXHIBIT(S)

Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S)

Santana Deposition Transcript

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Demand for Oral Examination

EXHIBIT(S)

Notice of Claim

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kujawa, R.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Kujawa, R.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Huggins, M.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Huggins, M.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Lorenz, W.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) Complaint Summary Report; Filed By: Lorenz, W.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Note of Issue; Filed By: Lorenz, W.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Santana Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Lorenz, W.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Schultz Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Lorenz, W.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Huggins, M.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Demand for Oral Examination; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cohen, S.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less