This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 16:46:02 (UTC).

Joann Huger - v. - Westbury Hotel, LLC., et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 Joann Huger filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Westbury Hotel, LLC . This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joann Huger

Defendants

Westbury Hotel, LLC. d/b/a Hampton Inn

Westbury Hotel, LLC.,

Hampton Inns Management, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOEFER, KENNETH T

Attorney at Kravet Hoefer and Maher PC

Defendant Attorneys

SOLIMAN, MICHAEL W.

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

SALESE, DANIELLE M

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Salese, D.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/01/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/01/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with notice of entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with notice of entry; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DECISION/ORDER DATED 10/17/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DECISION/ORDER DATED 10/17/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Geovanny Espinosa

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Geovanny Espinosa; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) incident report

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) incident report; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Proper Venue and attachments

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Proper Venue and attachments; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff. service Hamptons Inns Mgmt. LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff. service Hamptons Inns Mgmt. LLC; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* corrected S/C

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* corrected S/C; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Salese, D.; Filed: 06/21/2018; Received: 06/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/01/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with notice of entry; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DECISION/ORDER DATED 10/17/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/03/2017; Received: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Affidavit of Geovanny Espinosa; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) incident report; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) summons complaint.; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Proper Venue and attachments; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Soliman, M.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff. service Hamptons Inns Mgmt. LLC; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* corrected S/C; Filed By: Hoefer, K.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less